This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 13:43:48 (UTC).

Martin v. Universal Protection Service, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Martin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Universal Protection Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonie M. Brinkema and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Martin

Defendant

Universal Protection Service, LLC doing business as Allied Universal Security Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roya Vasseghi

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9125776.), filed by Kelly Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Kelly Martin. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

3 #1

Notice to Attorney

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons served on Rene Nordquist on 11/01/2023, filed by Kelly Martin. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Martin Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023 (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Martin Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023 (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons served on Rene Nordquist on 11/01/2023, filed by Kelly Martin. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Kelly Martin. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (nneb) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9125776.), filed by Kelly Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less