This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2023 at 09:13:12 (UTC).

Lizeth Cherry v. QVC, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Lizeth Cherry filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against QVC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lizeth Cherry

Defendants

QVC, Inc.

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sandeep J Shah

Defendant Attorneys

Sharde Thomas Skahan

Bernard Olshansky

Timothy L. Hix

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2223087 Receipt No: ACACDC-34970397 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Attorney Sharde Thomas Skahan added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft))(Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Sharde T. Skahan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Alicia Keane re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., identifying 1. Plaintiff Lizeth Cherry; 2. Defendant, QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Declaration #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Declaration #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on March 16, 2023. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00461 GW (SHKx). (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#11

(#11) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16-15.7, AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL CURRENTLY SET DATES filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#13

(#13) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on March 30, 2023. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 60 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for June 1, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on May 31, 2023. (aco) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)-(B) filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #14 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all claims, causes of action, and parties. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #14 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all claims, causes of action, and parties. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)-(B) filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on March 30, 2023. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 60 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for June 1, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on May 31, 2023. (aco) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16-15.7, AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL CURRENTLY SET DATES filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00461 GW (SHKx). (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant QVC, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 3/15/2023, attached to Skahan Decl. as Exhibit C. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff QVC, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 12/15/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Declaration #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Declaration #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on March 16, 2023. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., identifying 1. Plaintiff Lizeth Cherry; 2. Defendant, QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Alicia Keane re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Sharde T. Skahan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2223087 Receipt No: ACACDC-34970397 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Attorney Sharde Thomas Skahan added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft))(Skahan, Sharde) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less