This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 09:19:15 (UTC).

Salgado v. Schweigert et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 Salgado filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schweigert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02899

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmin Salgado

Defendants

Jason Schweigert

Moeller Trucking, Inc.

XYZ Corporations # 1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Alan Shea

Anita Marie Lamar

Defendant Attorneys

James E. Gilson

Navroz Tharani

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moeller Trucking, Inc.. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/6/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jasmin Salgado. (Lamar, Anita) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#5

(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate of Discovery by Arch Insurance Company, Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert, XYZ Corporations # 1-3.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#7

(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Arch Insurance Company, Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert, XYZ Corporations # 1-3. (Peterzell, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit filing event(tmf). (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The discovery period shall be for eight (8) months, through and including March 29, 2024. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/24/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The discovery period shall be for eight (8) months, through and including March 29, 2024. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/24/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Arch Insurance Company, Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert, XYZ Corporations # 1-3. (Peterzell, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit filing event(tmf). (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Arch Insurance Company, Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert, XYZ Corporations # 1-3. (Peterzell, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit filing event(tmf). (Entered: 08/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate of Discovery by Arch Insurance Company, Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert, XYZ Corporations # 1-3.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Moeller Trucking, Inc., Jason Schweigert. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jasmin Salgado. (Lamar, Anita) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/6/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moeller Trucking, Inc.. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Separated out exhibits to Notice of Removal and attached them to Docket Entry #1 . (dnb) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jason Schweigert, Moeller Trucking, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12707758) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2023: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (dnb). (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less