This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2023 at 07:17:26 (UTC).

Reeves et al v. MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech

Case Summary

On 02/11/2023 Reeves filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:23-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Robert Reeves

Howell Howard

Defendant and Counter Claimant

MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

William Stephen Shires

Gregory Blake Thompson

J. Mark Mann

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Leisa Talbert Peschel

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Original ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Robert Reeves.(Shires, William) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

3 #7

Exhibit G Trade Publication

3 #6

Exhibit F Website Printout

3 #5

Exhibit E Correspondence

3 #4

Exhibit D Plaintiffs Demand Letter

3 #3

Exhibit C Termination Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B Subscription Agreement

3 #1

Exhibit A Master Distributor Agreement

3 #3

Main Document

1 #9

Exhibit C AgriTech Notice of Removal (State Court)

1 #8

Exhibit B Demand Letter from Plaintiffs

1 #7

Exhibit A-5 Returned Service

1 #6

Exhibit A-4 Service on Registered Agent

1 #5

Exhibit A-3 Order for Alt Service

1 #4

Exhibit A-2 Motion for Alt Service

1 #3

Exhibit A-1 First Amended Petition

1 #2

Exhibit A Shelby County Docket Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Original ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Robert Reeves.(Shires, William) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Plaintiff Howell Howard's ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Howell Howard.(Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/9/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 5/13/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/17/23. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 3/17/2023. Court will enter scheduling order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - William Shires, Gregory Blake Thompson; Defense - Leisa Peschel. (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (jmv, ) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Protective Order)(Peschel, Leisa) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech (Peschel, Leisa) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robert Reeves Notice of Service of Initial Mnadatory Disclosures (Shires, William) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Howell Howard Initial Mandatory Disclosures (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Robert Reeves (hereinafter"Reeves")'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant's Counterclaims. Reeves' deadline to answer or otherwise respond is now March 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/9/23. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

Docket***Time correction from P.M. to A.M.*** This case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on March 17, 2023 at 11:30 a.m., in Room 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to extend deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's counterclaims [dkt. 8] is hereby granted. Plaintiff's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is now March 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/3/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Howell Howard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William Stephen Shires and Substitute Mann, Tindel, Thompson as Counsel of Record by Howell Howard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech (Peschel, Leisa) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before March 1, 2023. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on March 17, 2023 at 11:30 p.m., in Room 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/14/23. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Robert Reeves & Howell Howard.(ljw, ) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Howell Howard, Robert Reeves by MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Master Distributor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Subscription Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Termination Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E Correspondence, #6 Exhibit F Website Printout, #7 Exhibit G Trade Publication)(Peschel, Leisa) (Entered: 02/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: (Civil Cover Sheet and Attorney list) #1 Notice of Removal (Peschel, Leisa) Modified on 2/13/2023 (ljw, ). (Entered: 02/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech from 123rd Judicial District Court of Shelby County, case number 23CV36271. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9352160), filed by MAOF America, LLC d/b/a AgriTech. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Shelby County Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-1 First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit A-2 Motion for Alt Service, #5 Exhibit A-3 Order for Alt Service, #6 Exhibit A-4 Service on Registered Agent, #7 Exhibit A-5 Returned Service, #8 Exhibit B Demand Letter from Plaintiffs, #9 Exhibit C AgriTech Notice of Removal (State Court))(Peschel, Leisa) (Entered: 02/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less