This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2023 at 07:03:19 (UTC).

HDI Global Insurance Co. v. Maersk A/S

Case Summary

On 06/15/2023 HDI Global Insurance Co filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Maersk A/S. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer L. Rochon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-05033

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Rochon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO.

Defendant

MAERSK A/S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Aloysius Saville, Jr.

Charles Mitchell Henderson, III

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MAERSK A/S. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27877520)Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAERSK A/S, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG for HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO.. Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Mitchell Henderson, III on behalf of HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/29/2023) (tg) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Maersk A/S waiver sent on 6/28/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. Document filed by HDI Global Insurance Co...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Conference served on Maersk A/S on July 3, 2023. Service was made by email. Document filed by HDI Global Insurance Co...(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Conference served on Maersk A/S on July 3, 2023. Service was made by email. Document filed by HDI Global Insurance Co...(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Maersk A/S waiver sent on 6/28/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. Document filed by HDI Global Insurance Co...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/29/2023) (tg) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Aloysius Saville, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Aloysius Saville, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO., MAERSK A/S. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Mitchell Henderson, III on behalf of HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG for HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO.. Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAERSK A/S, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MAERSK A/S. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27877520)Document filed by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE CO...(Saville, James) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less