This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2023 at 12:30:44 (UTC).

Lexi Ramirez et al v. FCA US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2023 Lexi Ramirez filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia G. Rosenberg and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04689

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lexi Ramirez

Adalberto Ramirez

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark William Gibson

Elizabeth A LaRocque

Tionna Grace Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Tsai

Spencer Peter Hugret

Timothy Alexander Hanna

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Re: Attorney Fees and Costs (Doc. #23 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court hereby enters an ORDER for Defendant to payPlaintiffs $16,000.00 to resolve attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiffs within 60 days from the signing of the Parties' Stipulation dated 10/25/2023. After satisfaction of payment, Plaintiffs will dismiss this case with prejudice within 10 business days against all parties. (jp) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

23 #1

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order

#23

(#23) Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $16,000.00. filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees, Csots, and Expenses (Doc. #21 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: The filing deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses is CONTINUED from 9/25/2023 to 10/25/2023. (jp) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

21 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE

#21

(#21) Joint STIPULATION to Continue JURISDICTION from August 24, 2023 to September 25, 2023 filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#20

(#20) ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction (Doc. #19 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

19 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE

#19

(#19) Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

1 #20

Exhibit S to ET Decl

1 #18

Exhibit Q to ET Decl

1 #16

Exhibit O to ET Decl

1 #11

Exhibit J to ET Decl

1 #10

Exhibit I to ET Decl

1 #9

Exhibit H to ET Decl

1 #7

Exhibit F to ET Decl

1 #5

Exhibit D to ET Decl

1 #3

Exhibit B to ET Decl

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Re: Attorney Fees and Costs (Doc. #23 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court hereby enters an ORDER for Defendant to payPlaintiffs $16,000.00 to resolve attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiffs within 60 days from the signing of the Parties' Stipulation dated 10/25/2023. After satisfaction of payment, Plaintiffs will dismiss this case with prejudice within 10 business days against all parties. (jp) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $16,000.00. filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees, Csots, and Expenses (Doc. #21 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: The filing deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses is CONTINUED from 9/25/2023 to 10/25/2023. (jp) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Joint STIPULATION to Continue JURISDICTION from August 24, 2023 to September 25, 2023 filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction (Doc. #19 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Lexi Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $218,000.00 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer #13 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) DECLARATION of ELIZABETH A. LAROCQUE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Lexi Ramirez. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Lexi Ramirez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lexi Ramirez. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Lexi Ramirez(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Glenn E. Thomas Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Adalberto Ramirez, Lexi Ramirez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/08/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of Debtor-in-Possession FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party FCA US LLC(pty:db_pos))(Hanna, Timothy) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Debtor-in-Possession FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:db_pos))(Hugret, Spencer) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric Tsai on behalf of Debtor-in-Possession FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.), Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Debtor-in-Possession FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22LBCV00762 Receipt No: ACACDC-35493600 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of ET iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to ET Decl, #3 Exhibit B to ET Decl, #4 Exhibit C to ET Decl, #5 Exhibit D to ET Decl, #6 Exhibit E to ET Decl, #7 Exhibit F to ET Decl, #8 Exhibit G to ET Decl, #9 Exhibit H to ET Decl, #10 Exhibit I to ET Decl, #11 Exhibit J to ET Decl, #12 Exhibit K to ET Decl, #13 Exhibit L to ET Decl, #14 Exhibit M to ET Decl, #15 Exhibit N to ET Decl, #16 Exhibit O to ET Decl, #17 Exhibit P to ET Decl, #18 Exhibit Q to ET Decl, #19 Exhibit R to ET Decl, #20 Exhibit S to ET Decl, #21 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Eric Tsai added to party FCA US LLC(pty:db_pos))(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less