This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2023 at 07:47:55 (UTC).

Webster v. Rausch Sturm LLP et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 Webster filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Rausch Sturm LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilhelmina M. Wright and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01664

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lashondra Webster

Defendants

Rausch Sturm LLP

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Carter B Lyons

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Pfau

Patrick D Newman

Margaret Ann Santos

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Consent Form

#23

(#23) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/29/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

#22

(#22) Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC answer due 7/25/2023; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 7/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/12/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#19

(#19) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP.(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#18

(#18) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP.(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#9

(#14) ORDER on #9 Stipulation, #12 Stipulation. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC answer due 7/11/2023; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 7/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pfau on behalf of Rausch Sturm LLP. (Pfau, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D Newman on behalf of Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lashondra Webster. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lashondra Webster. Rausch Sturm LLP served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP. (MMP) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10324280) filed by Lashondra Webster. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Carter) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/29/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC answer due 7/25/2023; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 7/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/12/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP.(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP.(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Date and time to be determined. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER on #9 Stipulation, #12 Stipulation. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC answer due 7/11/2023; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 7/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Rausch Sturm LLP. Jointly Signed by Lashondra Webster. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pfau on behalf of Rausch Sturm LLP. (Pfau, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D Newman on behalf of Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lashondra Webster. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lashondra Webster. Rausch Sturm LLP served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP. (MMP) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-1664 (WMW/DTS).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10324280) filed by Lashondra Webster. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Carter) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less