This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2023 at 08:05:55 (UTC).

TAM v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 TAM filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02128

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KELLEY BRISBON HODGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTIN TAM

Defendants

TRANS UNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS

CONTRACT CALLERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENT F. VULLINGS

Defendant Attorney

JAKOB F. WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CONTRACT CALLERS, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16731737.), filed by JUSTIN TAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CONTRACT CALLERS, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, TRANS UNION, LLC. (amas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: William R. Scott served Summons and Complaint upon CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. by personal service. CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Rochelle Earthwise served Summons and Complaint upon CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. by personal service. CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. served on 6/16/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Michael Danley served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Rochelle Earthwise served Summons and Complaint upon NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS by personal service. NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS served on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Rochelle Earthwise served Summons and Complaint upon NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS by personal service. NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS served on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Michael Danley served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: Rochelle Earthwise served Summons and Complaint upon CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. by personal service. CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. served on 6/16/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM re: William R. Scott served Summons and Complaint upon CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. by personal service. CONTRACT CALLERS, INC. served on 6/7/2023, answer due 6/28/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUSTIN TAM. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CONTRACT CALLERS, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, TRANS UNION, LLC. (amas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CONTRACT CALLERS, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16731737.), filed by JUSTIN TAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less