This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2023 at 07:41:47 (UTC).

ALMANZAR v. NELSON et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 ALMANZAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NELSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02255

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRA ALMANZAR

Defendants and Cross Claimants

WILLIAM NELSON

SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

JOHN DOES 1-10

JANE DOES 1-10

ABC COMPANY 1-10

XYZ CORPORATION 1-10

INC RYDER

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

JOHN DOES 1-10

JANE DOES 1-10

ABC COMPANY 1-10

XYZ CORPORATION 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARAT FIKHMAN

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

KEITH HARRIS

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON from Essex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-6343-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-14267331), filed by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,. (HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC COMPANY 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATION 1-10 by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON.(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#4

(#4) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/26/23. (LM, ) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#5

(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY by WILLIAM NELSON, SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, INC RYDER. (HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#6

(#6) Letter from Fikhman & Associates. (FIKHMAN, MARAT) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#8

(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by WILLIAM NELSON, SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,.(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#9

(#9) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 11/8/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 23-2255. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 11/8/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 23-2255. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/20/2023. (LM, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by WILLIAM NELSON, SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,.(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the Rule 16 initial scheduling conference set for June 8, 2023 is adjourned to June 20, 2023 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/7/2023. (rn) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Fikhman & Associates. (FIKHMAN, MARAT) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY by WILLIAM NELSON, SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, INC RYDER. (HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/26/23. (LM, ) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC COMPANY 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATION 1-10 by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON.(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,. (HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON from Essex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-6343-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-14267331), filed by SHENANDOAH GROWERS INC,, WILLIAM NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, KEITH) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less