This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:04:06 (UTC).

HESTER et al v. HESTER

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 HESTER filed an Other lawsuit against HESTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-MC-00033

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.

MLI RX, LLC

In Re and Respondent

TIMOTHY C. HESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bradley Demuth

Joseph M Vanek

Raymond Nicholas Barto

In Re Attorney

Christian James Pistilli

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #1 Petitioners' Motion to Enforce and granting #5 Respondent's Motion to Quash. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-17-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Nicholas Barto on behalf of MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Barto, Raymond) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Demuth on behalf of MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION to Quash Subpoena by TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Pistilli, Christian) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

1 #6

Text of Proposed Order

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Declaration

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) MOTION to Enforce by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztth) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER denying #1 Petitioners' Motion to Enforce and granting #5 Respondent's Motion to Quash. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-17-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Nicholas Barto on behalf of MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Barto, Raymond) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Demuth on behalf of MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketMINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners may file a reply on or before April 12, 2023 at noon. SO ORDERED. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Memorandum in opposition to re #1 Motion to Enforce filed by TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Pistilli, Christian) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to Quash Subpoena by TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Pistilli, Christian) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Respondent Timothy C. Hester shall respond to #1 Petitioners' Motion to Enforce on or before April 10, 2023. A hearing will not be scheduled unless the Court deems it necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-7-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #2 #3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that Bradley J. Demuth and Raymond N. Barto are admitted to represent Petitioners pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-7-2023. (lcrc3) Modified on 4/7/2023 to correct linkage.(ztnr) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process and Subpoena by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Process Server)(Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Raymond N. Barto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9983178. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond N. Barto in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bradley J. Demuth, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9982948. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley J. Demuth in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketFiling fee received: $ 49, receipt number: 204366. (ztth) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION to Enforce by MLI RX, LLC, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztth) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less