This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2023 at 06:13:43 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. AT&T Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Schroeder, III and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Communications LLC

AT&T Mobility

AT&T Mobility II LLC

AT&T Services Inc.

Ericsson Inc.

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Claire Abernathy Henry

Cristofer Ivan Leffler

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

Deron R Dacus

John R Gibson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to (1) open a new case between Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc. and Defendants AT&T Corp., AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc, EricssonInc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, (2) terminate Defendants Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson from the above-captioned case, and (3) consolidate the severed case with the above-captioned lead case for pretrial purposes. The parties shall continue filing in the above-captioned lead case. The remaining request to stay the severed cases as to AT&T is DENIED (CASE SEVERED FROM 2:22-CV-12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/11/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#2

(#2) FILED IN ERROR Claim Construction Chart by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Claim Construction Chart))(Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 4/14/2023 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/13/2023)

2 #1

Exhibit A (Joint Claim Construction Chart)

#3

(#3) ORDER STAYING CASE - Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that all further District Court proceedings in Member Case No. 2:23-cv-0161 are hereby stayed until June 15, 2023, by which time the parties shall file dismissal papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/26/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER - granting Joint Motion to Extend Stay in Member Case No. 2:23-CV-00161. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - AT&T Corp, AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility, AT&TMobility II LLC, and AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericssons(Defendants) of Member Case No. 2:23-CV-00161. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - AT&T Corp, AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility, AT&TMobility II LLC, and AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericssons(Defendants) of Member Case No. 2:23-CV-00161. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - granting Joint Motion to Extend Stay in Member Case No. 2:23-CV-00161. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER STAYING CASE - Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that all further District Court proceedings in Member Case No. 2:23-cv-0161 are hereby stayed until June 15, 2023, by which time the parties shall file dismissal papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/26/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR - This case is consolidated, please file in the lead case. Document # 2, Claim Construction Chart. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILED IN ERROR Claim Construction Chart by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Claim Construction Chart))(Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 4/14/2023 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to (1) open a new case between Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc. and Defendants AT&T Corp., AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc, EricssonInc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, (2) terminate Defendants Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson from the above-captioned case, and (3) consolidate the severed case with the above-captioned lead case for pretrial purposes. The parties shall continue filing in the above-captioned lead case. The remaining request to stay the severed cases as to AT&T is DENIED (CASE SEVERED FROM 2:22-CV-12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/11/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less