This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2023 at 08:03:48 (UTC).

Cristina Zavalza v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 Cristina Zavalza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-08198

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cristina Zavalza

Defendants

Walmart Inc. doing business as Sams Club

Does 1 to 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allan L Dollison

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore C Peters

John M. Beemer

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Declaration of Allan Dollison

#12

(#12) REPLY SUPPORT First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allan Dollison)(Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

11 #1

Declaration Dec of Theodore C. Peters, Esq.

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Theodore C. Peters In support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of Theodore C. Peters, Esq.)(Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

10 #6

Exhibit D

10 #5

Exhibit C

10 #4

Exhibit B

10 #3

Exhibit A

10 #2

Declaration of Allan Dollison

10 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#10

(#10) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Allan Dollison, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for December 11, 2023 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-CV-08198 ODW(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#7

(#7) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. (Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Walmart Inc... (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

4 #1

CV-11C

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) The hearing on the MOTION to Remand Case #10 , scheduled for November 20, 2023 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) REPLY SUPPORT First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allan Dollison)(Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Theodore C. Peters In support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of Theodore C. Peters, Esq.)(Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Allan Dollison, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for December 11, 2023 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-CV-08198 ODW(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. (Dollison, Allan) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Walmart Inc... (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/25/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT 4 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Walmart Inc., filed by Plaintiff Cristina Zavalza. [FILED IN STATE COURT 06/21/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV20212 Receipt No: ACACDC-36136921 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Attorney Theodore C Peters added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Peters, Theodore) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less