This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 09:36:45 (UTC).

Michaels v. NewRez, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Michaels filed an Other lawsuit against NewRez, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariah Michaels

Defendants

NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Bank of New York Mellon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Solar

Brian D. Flick

Marc E. Dann

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint for damages with jury demand against NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12006003. Filed by Mariah Michaels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NOE Misapplication of Payments, #2 Exhibit 2 - NOE Unauthorized Charges and Misapplied Payments, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPS Delivery NOE, #4 Exhibit 4 - December 2022 Mortgage Stmnt, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan 17 2023 Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit 6 - CFPB Narratives, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons on BONY, #9 Proposed Summons on NewRez) (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - NOE Misapplication of Payments

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - NOE Unauthorized Charges and Misapplied Payments

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - USPS Delivery NOE

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - December 2022 Mortgage Stmnt

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Jan 17 2023 Notice of Default

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - CFPB Narratives

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Proposed Summons on BONY

1 #9

Proposed Summons on NewRez

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mariah Michaels. NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon waiver sent on 5/31/2023, answer due 7/30/2023 filed on behalf of Mariah Michaels (Flick, Brian) Modified on 6/7/2023 (L,Br). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mariah Michaels. NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon waiver sent on 5/31/2023, answer due 7/30/2023 filed on behalf of Mariah Michaels (Flick, Brian) Modified on 6/7/2023 (L,Br). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketJudge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for damages with jury demand against NewRez, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12006003. Filed by Mariah Michaels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NOE Misapplication of Payments, #2 Exhibit 2 - NOE Unauthorized Charges and Misapplied Payments, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPS Delivery NOE, #4 Exhibit 4 - December 2022 Mortgage Stmnt, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan 17 2023 Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit 6 - CFPB Narratives, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons on BONY, #9 Proposed Summons on NewRez) (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less