This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2023 at 11:07:50 (UTC).

Chapple v. FCA US, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2023 Chapple filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda Lopez and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01338

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda Lopez

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Chapple

Defendants

FCA US, LLC.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rabiya F. Tirmizi

Elizabeth A. LaRocque

Mark Gibson

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Alexander Hanna

Spencer Peter Hugret

Eric Tsai

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/30/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth A. LaRocque on behalf of Danny Chapple (LaRocque, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth A. LaRocque added to party Danny Chapple(pty:pla) (ddf). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi on behalf of Danny Chapple (Tirmizi, Rabiya)Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Danny Chapple(pty:pla) (ddf). (Entered: 08/23/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance ; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/24/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

1 #17

N

1 #16

M

1 #15

L

1 #13

J

1 #12

I

1 #10

G

1 #9

F

1 #8

E

1 #7

D

1 #6

C

1 #5

B

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Declaration of Atty iso Removal

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/30/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/30/2023. The case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2023. Written order to issue.(no document attached) (itp) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Danny Chapple (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (ddf). (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth A. LaRocque on behalf of Danny Chapple (LaRocque, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth A. LaRocque added to party Danny Chapple(pty:pla) (ddf). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi on behalf of Danny Chapple (Tirmizi, Rabiya)Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Danny Chapple(pty:pla) (ddf). (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

Docket(#9) Minute Order by Judge Linda Lopez: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate Defendant Carl Burger Dodge Chrysler Jeep World from this matter, pursuant to the request for dismissal without prejudice as to this party filed by Plaintiff on July 17, 2023 (ECF No. 1-5) prior to removal. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 7/28/2023.(fk1) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance ; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/24/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by FCA US, LLC.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q)(Tsai, Eric) (ddf). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (ddf). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanna, Timothy) (ddf). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Tsai on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (ddf). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (ddf). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US, LLC.. (rxc) (sjt). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18036771.), filed by FCA US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, #3 Proof of Service, #4 A, #5 B, #6 C, #7 D, #8 E, #9 F, #10 G, #11 H, #12 I, #13 J, #14 K, #15 L, #16 M, #17 N, #18 O)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1338-LL-KSC. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(rxc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/21/2023) (rxc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2023) (rxc). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/21/2023) (rxc). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/21/2023) (rxc). (sjt). (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less