This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2023 at 07:35:07 (UTC).

Freedom Patents LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2023 Freedom Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Verizon Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Patents LLC

Defendants

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Verizon Online, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine Susan Bartles

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Zachariah Harrington

Matthew J Antonelli

Rehan Mohammed Safiullah

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#16

(#16) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Online, LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Cellco Partnership served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Verizon Online, LLC served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Online, LLC. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9442200.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership to 7/17/2023; Verizon Communications, Inc. to 7/17/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mcg) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Online, LLC to 7/17/2023. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mcg) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Online, LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Cellco Partnership served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Verizon Online, LLC served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Online, LLC. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9442200.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less