This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2023 at 09:30:38 (UTC).

Mohamed Elbaneh v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 06/23/2023 Mohamed Elbaneh filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Brianna Fuller Mircheff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04985

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherilyn Peace Garnett

Referral Judge

Brianna Fuller Mircheff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMED ELBANEH

Defendant

THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank N Darras

Phillip S Bather

Susan B Grabarsky

Defendant Attorneys

Jason A James

Jonathan H. Semerjian

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35544079 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party MOHAMED ELBANEH(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the summons at docket entry no. 8 was issued with the incorrect spelling of defendant's name. See the corrected summons issued at docket entry no. 10. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mohamed Elbaneh, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 7/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist of C.T. Corporation - Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 9/1/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 9/1/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mohamed Elbaneh, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 7/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist of C.T. Corporation - Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the summons at docket entry no. 8 was issued with the incorrect spelling of defendant's name. See the corrected summons issued at docket entry no. 10. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (jtil) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35544079 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MOHAMED ELBANEH. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party MOHAMED ELBANEH(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less