This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2023 at 07:29:38 (UTC).

Tawfik et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 Tawfik filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane Gujarati. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-06271

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emad A. Tawfik

Marina Youseff

Minor Child C.E.T.

Defendants

United States of America

U.S. Department of State

Antony Blinken

U.S. Embassy in Cairo

John P. Desrocher

John Doe(s) 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronen Sarraf

Defendant Attorney

Toniann Territola

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before November 6, 2023 , in writing, why a #1 Writ of Mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiffs, with proof of such service to the Clerk of Court. On or before December 6, 2023, Plaintiffs shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Oral argument shall be heard on December 28, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. via teleconference before Judge Diane Gujarati. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. The parties should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/6/2023. (KA) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023

DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ECS) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Minor Child C.E.T., Emad A. Tawfik, Marina Youseff NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Sarraf, Ronen) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before November 6, 2023 , in writing, why a #1 Writ of Mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiffs, with proof of such service to the Clerk of Court. On or before December 6, 2023, Plaintiffs shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Oral argument shall be heard on December 28, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. via teleconference before Judge Diane Gujarati. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. The parties should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/6/2023. (KA) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Toniann Territola on behalf of Antony Blinken, John P. Desrocher, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Cairo, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Territola, Toniann) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, John P. Desrocher, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Cairo, United States of America. (SR) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, John P. Desrocher, John Doe(s) 1-10, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Cairo, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17009610 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Minor Child C.E.T., Marina Youseff, Emad A. Tawfik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sarraf, Ronen) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less