This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 08:29:25 (UTC).

Life Vac LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Life Vac LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03305

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Life Vac LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Mohamed Shalaby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake C Goebel

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's motion for withdrawal of attorney of record #33 and #34 is granted. Attorney David Edward Hutchinson and Christopher Tom are terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

#38

(#38) LETTER from Defendant Mohamed Shalaby dated 7/10/2023. (Exhibits). (jj, ) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#37

(#37) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Mohamed Shalaby. (jj, ) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Blake C Goebel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #34 , motion to withdraw as attorney #33 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/20/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

34 #1

Affidavit

#34

(#34) MOTION by Attorney Christopher Tom to withdraw as attorney for Life Vac LLC. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

33 #1

Affidavit

#33

(#33) MOTION by Attorney David Hutchinson to withdraw as attorney for Life Vac LLC. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#32

(#32) STATEMENT emails attached to summons form. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#6

(#6) CLAIM by Life Vac LLC regarding Trademark. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Life Vac LLC (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Vac LLC by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Trademark

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint - Copyrights

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Life Vac LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20673406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint - Copyrights, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Trademark, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's motion for withdrawal of attorney of record #33 and #34 is granted. Attorney David Edward Hutchinson and Christopher Tom are terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) LETTER from Defendant Mohamed Shalaby dated 7/10/2023. (Exhibits). (jj, ) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Mohamed Shalaby. (jj, ) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Blake C Goebel for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #34 , motion to withdraw as attorney #33 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/20/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION by Attorney Christopher Tom to withdraw as attorney for Life Vac LLC. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION by Attorney David Hutchinson to withdraw as attorney for Life Vac LLC. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATEMENT emails attached to summons form. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff has failed to file a status report required by minute entry no. #17 , as to non-dismissed defendant. Status hearing is reset for 8/14/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The parties shall file a joint status report by 8/7/2023 and the court will enter an appropriate order. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Vac LLC by Blake C Goebel (Goebel, Blake) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Parties to take note of Judge Bucklo's motion call practice posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff's motion for appearance of additional attorney #28 is granted. Attorney Blake C Goebel for Life Vac LLC is directed to file his appearance. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Plaintiff Life Vac LLC for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation Regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Internet Stores, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by E-mail and Electronic Publication. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLAIM by Life Vac LLC regarding Copyrights. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLAIM by Life Vac LLC regarding Trademark. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Life Vac LLC (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Life Vac LLC Schedule A to Complaint. (Hutchinson, David) Modified on 6/28/2023 (daj, ). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Vac LLC by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Life Vac LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20673406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint - Copyrights, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Trademark, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less