This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 08:08:20 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Xerox Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 Flexiworld Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Xerox Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-06370

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Xerox Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Austin Ginnings

Timothy Edward Grochocinski

Peter John Glennon

Defendant Attorney

Eric J. Ward

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Xerox Corporation for Xerox Corporation.. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION extending time to answer complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Ward on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Xerox Corporation C/O Corporation Service Company on July 13, 2023, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

8 #5

ECF Registration

8 #4

Civility Principles

8 #2

Sponsorship Affidavit

8 #1

Petition for Attorney Admission

#8

(#8) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4925805.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

1 #9

AO 120 Form

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Errata

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4912697, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Errata, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 AO 120 Form)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2023

Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the stipulation signed by the parties (Dkt. 13), Defendant's response to the complaint in Case No. 6:23-CV-06370 is due on or before September 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/03/2023. (CAL) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Xerox Corporation for Xerox Corporation.. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STIPULATION extending time to answer complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Ward on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS Returned Executed #9 Xerox Corporation served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. (RE) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Timothy Edward Grochocinski. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 07/18/2023. (CAL)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Charles Austin Ginnings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 07/18/2023. (CAL)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Xerox Corporation C/O Corporation Service Company on July 13, 2023, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4925805.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4925788.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4923695.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Affidavit Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4923678.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Affidavit Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 ECF Registration, #5 Civility Principles)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(RE) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (RE) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(RE) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Xerox Corporation. (RE) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (RE) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4912697, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Errata, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 AO 120 Form)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less