This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2023 at 08:00:44 (UTC).

BAILEY v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2023 BAILEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03270

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANET BAILEY

Defendants

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

JANSSEN ORTHO LLC

JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY

ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

ALZA CORPORATION

TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I

In Re

ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLEN A PRESBY

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14390104) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JANET BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Designation of Forum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A Designation of Forum

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by JANET BAILEY as to ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I. (PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET BAILEY. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 07/30/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET BAILEY. JANSSEN ORTHO LLC served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 07/30/2023)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

07/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET BAILEY. JANSSEN ORTHO LLC served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 07/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET BAILEY. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 07/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 6/14/23, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketThis case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (gh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by JANET BAILEY as to ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I. (PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALZA CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS I ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14390104) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JANET BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Designation of Forum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(PRESBY, ELLEN) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less