This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2023 at 08:38:18 (UTC).

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02942

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV

Defendant and Counter Claimant

HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

KEITH J. MILLER

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#15

(#15) Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Sharon A. King, U.S.M.J. Requesting Adjournment of Initial Scheduling Conference. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#13

(#13) Order Initial Conference set for 8/15/2023 at 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/10/2023. (alb, ) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. by HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

10 #6

Text of Proposed Order

10 #4

Declaration of D. Dalke

10 #3

Declaration of J. Wong

10 #1

Declaration of James Richter

#4

(#4) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., WEST-WARD COLUMBUS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14351927) , Related Case Selected, filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the July 21, 2023 letter submitted by Keith J. Miller, Esquire [ECF No. 15], counsel for Plaintiff; it is hereby ORDERED that the initial conference scheduled for August 15, 2023 is RESCHEDULED to September 27, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 2961061#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/25/23. (mb, ) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Sharon A. King, U.S.M.J. Requesting Adjournment of Initial Scheduling Conference. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on August 15, 2023 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/11/23. (mb, ) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Order Initial Conference set for 8/15/2023 at 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/10/2023. (alb, ) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. by HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSet Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Consent. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Consent by HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Richter, #2 Declaration of C. Klein, #3 Declaration of J. Wong, #4 Declaration of D. Dalke, #5 Declaration of A. Graham, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSet Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing without prejudice defendants HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC and WEST-WARD COLUMBUS INC. and amending caption. The time for HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended until 7/7/2023. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/15/2023. (jab) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Letter from Michael J. Gesualdo, Esq. to Hon. Karen M. Williams, U.S.D.J. Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketJudge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., WEST-WARD COLUMBUS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14351927) , Related Case Selected, filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less