This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2023 at 09:24:28 (UTC).

Crawford v. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Crawford filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Crawford

Defendant

G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Clifton Gordon

Austin W. Anderson

Carter T. Hastings

William Clifton Alexander

Lauren E. Braddy

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17444901), filed by David Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Crawford. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Crawford as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2023

DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Crawford as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Crawford. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17444901), filed by David Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less