This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2023 at 09:06:08 (UTC).

Evans v. Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 Evans filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:23-CV-80521

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny James Evans

Defendants

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Safeway, Inc.

Walgreen Co.

Albertson's Companies Inc.

Apotex Corporation

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Chattem, Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Granules USA, Inc.

L. Perrigo Co.

Strides Pharma, Inc.

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Latoya Chambers

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnny James Evans. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 4/10/2023, response/answer due 6/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Waiver of Summons)(Chambers, Latoya) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (nan) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Wrong Venue selected by Filer. Pursuant to Pretrial Order # 80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR, the proper venue should be 3 (Zantac MDL-2924 ONLY). It is not necessary to re-file the case. (nan) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 9:23-cv-80521. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (nan) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16498410, filed by Johnny James Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Latoya) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less