This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 10:27:43 (UTC).

BUTLER v. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 BUTLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-03587

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRED BUTLER

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC I. SIMON

Paraskevoula Mamounas

Defendant Attorney

CATHERINE THERESA BARONE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16947454.), filed by FRED BUTLER.(SIMON, MARC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/15/2023) (sbt). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/15/23 (dt) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paraskevoula Mamounas on behalf of FRED BUTLER (Mamounas, Paraskevoula) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL re: served COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND DISCOVERY REQUESTS upon ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by CERTIFIED MAIL on 09/25/2023 (SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF 10/31/23 THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S RECORD SHOWS THAT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY HAS NOT FILED AN ANSWER OR PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. IF PLAINITFF, FRED BUTLER DOES NOT TAKE ANY ACITON IN THIS CASE, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/31/23. 10/31/23 ENTERED (copy e-mailed to counsel). (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) Modified on 11/1/2023 (dt). (Entered: 10/31/2023)

#6

(#6) Request for Default FRED BUTLER against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (SIMON, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2023 (nd). (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF 11/2/23 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 55(A) (ECF NO. 6), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY, INC., COMPANY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST (ECF NO. 6) NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 4, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO EFFECT SERVICE OF THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DOCKET A PROOF OF SERVICE NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 15, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY, INC., COMPANY. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/2/23. 11/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE THERESA BARONE on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

9 #1

Jury Demand

#10

(#10) MOTION to Withdraw DEFAULT filed by FRED BUTLER..(SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Allstate Corporation with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Hearing that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, December 14, 2023 at 1:00 PM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, December 4, 2023. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF 11/3/23 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT (ECF NO. 6), PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 9), DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 10), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO. 10) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/3/23. 11/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER OF 11/3/23 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT (ECF NO. 6), PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 9), DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 10), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO. 10) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/3/23. 11/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, December 14, 2023 at 1:00 PM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, December 4, 2023. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Allstate Corporation with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw DEFAULT filed by FRED BUTLER..(SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE THERESA BARONE on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BARONE, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketCOPY OF DOC. NO. 7 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. (bw) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER OF 11/2/23 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 55(A) (ECF NO. 6), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY, INC., COMPANY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST (ECF NO. 6) NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 4, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO EFFECT SERVICE OF THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DOCKET A PROOF OF SERVICE NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 15, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY, INC., COMPANY. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/2/23. 11/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketMailed doc. 5 to Unrep.(er) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Request for Default FRED BUTLER against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (SIMON, MARC) Modified on 11/2/2023 (nd). (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER OF 10/31/23 THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S RECORD SHOWS THAT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY HAS NOT FILED AN ANSWER OR PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. IF PLAINITFF, FRED BUTLER DOES NOT TAKE ANY ACITON IN THIS CASE, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/31/23. 10/31/23 ENTERED (copy e-mailed to counsel). (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) Modified on 11/1/2023 (dt). (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL re: served COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND DISCOVERY REQUESTS upon ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by CERTIFIED MAIL on 09/25/2023 (SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paraskevoula Mamounas on behalf of FRED BUTLER (Mamounas, Paraskevoula) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/15/23 (dt) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16947454.), filed by FRED BUTLER.(SIMON, MARC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/15/2023) (sbt). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less