This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 08:51:15 (UTC).

Alderink v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Alderink filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Docherty and Paul A. Magnuson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-02817

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Magnuson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Alderink

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric D Satre

Defendant Attorneys

Pablo Orozco

Kyle A. Petersen

Melissa K. Taft

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10532142) filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Complaint - Ex. 1 to Orozco Decl., #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Orozco, #4 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Paik, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

1 #1

Summons and Complaint Complaint - Ex. 1 to Orozco Decl.

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Declaration of Orozco

1 #4

Exhibit(s) Declaration of Paik

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Abbott Laboratories Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-2817 PAM/JFD. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/18/2023. (ACH) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 09:30 AM via Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

7 #1

26(f) Template

7 #2

Consent Form

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa K. Taft. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10577481 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle A. Petersen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10577502 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#11

(#11) AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 09:30 AM via Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/12/2023.(TJS) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 09:30 AM via Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/12/2023.(TJS) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Melissa K. Taft Abbott Laboratories, Inc.; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyle A. Petersen for Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/5/2023. (jam) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle A. Petersen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10577502 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa K. Taft. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10577481 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 09:30 AM via Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-2817 PAM/JFD. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/18/2023. (ACH) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kyle A. Peterson, Melissa K. Taft as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#3) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 23-cv-2817 JWB/JFD.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Abbott Laboratories Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10532142) filed by Abbott Laboratories Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Complaint - Ex. 1 to Orozco Decl., #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Orozco, #4 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Paik, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orozco, Pablo) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less