This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:44:45 (UTC).

Davidson v. Tesla, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Davidson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Tesla, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:23-CV-80804

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Davidson

Defendant

Tesla, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Davidson

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Danielle Duga Walsh

Robert Maurice Fulton

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #3

Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit State Court pending motions

1 #5

Exhibit State Court all other documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) STIPULATION To Cap Damages by Tesla, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. CLOSING CASE. Motions Terminated: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Tesla, Inc. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#9

(#9) TRANSMITTAL LETTER Sent with Copy of Order Remanding Case to State Court to: 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, FL. State Court Case Number: 502023CA009176XXXXMB. (caw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #9 Transmittal Letter Sent. (kpe) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #9 Transmittal Letter Sent. (kpe) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSMITTAL LETTER Sent with Copy of Order Remanding Case to State Court to: 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, FL. State Court Case Number: 502023CA009176XXXXMB. (caw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. CLOSING CASE. Motions Terminated: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Tesla, Inc. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Stipulation to Cap Damages #5 . The Stipulation appears to divest this Court of subject matter jurisdiction over this case. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). On or before June 15, 2023, the parties shall file a joint motion to remand that explains why remand is warranted, with reference to the parties' Stipulation #5 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/8/2023. (kts) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION To Cap Damages by Tesla, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16637329, filed by Tesla, Inc. No Answer / Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court pending motions, #5 Exhibit State Court all other documents)(Walsh, Nicole) Modified text & attachment description on 5/23/2023 (rbe). (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less