This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:36:22 (UTC).

A P C Construction L L C v. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 A P C Construction L L C filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Citi Approved Enterprise L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David J Ayo and David C Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David J Ayo

Presiding Judge

David C Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A P C Construction L L C

Defendants

Citi Approved Enterprise L L C

Western Surety Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin M Pri-Tal

Gerald A Melchiode

Kent William Patterson

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan S Forester

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT APC Construction LLC against Citi Approved Enterprise L L C, Western Surety Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5564954) filed by APC Construction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Gerald A Melchiode added to party APC Construction LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Melchiode, Gerald) Modified on 5/22/2023 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citi Approved Enterprise LLC, Western Surety Company. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A P C Construction L L C. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#4

(#4) AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A P C Construction L L C. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) Modified to edit text on 5/24/2023 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Kent W. Patterson to Enroll as Counsel by A P C Construction L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2023. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Kent William Patterson for A P C Construction L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 6/8/2023. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citi Approved Enterprise L L C. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C waiver sent on 6/23/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Attorney Jonathan S Forester added to party Citi Approved Enterprise L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Forester, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Western Surety Co. Western Surety Co waiver sent on 6/23/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Attorney Jonathan S Forester added to party Western Surety Co(pty:dft)) (aty,Forester, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Western Surety Co. Western Surety Co waiver sent on 6/23/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Attorney Jonathan S Forester added to party Western Surety Co(pty:dft)) (aty,Forester, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citi Approved Enterprise L L C. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C waiver sent on 6/23/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Attorney Jonathan S Forester added to party Citi Approved Enterprise L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Forester, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Kent William Patterson for A P C Construction L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 6/8/2023. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Kent W. Patterson to Enroll as Counsel by A P C Construction L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2023. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A P C Construction L L C. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) Modified to edit text on 5/24/2023 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A P C Construction L L C. (aty,Melchiode, Gerald) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citi Approved Enterprise LLC, Western Surety Company. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:23-cv-0675 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:23-cv-0675. Case assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT APC Construction LLC against Citi Approved Enterprise L L C, Western Surety Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5564954) filed by APC Construction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Gerald A Melchiode added to party APC Construction LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Melchiode, Gerald) Modified on 5/22/2023 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less