This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2023 at 06:13:31 (UTC).

Freedom Patents LLC v. AT&T Inc. et al

Case Summary

On May 10, 2023, Freedom Patents LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Matthew J. Antonelli, Zachariah S. Harrington, Larry D. Thompson, Jr., and Rehan M. Safiullah of Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP; and Stafford Davis and Catherine Bartles of The Stafford Davis Firm, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., and DirecTV, LLC (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking permanent injunction with damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District Of Texas.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “The patents-in-suit generally relate to improvements in wireless communication technology that allow users to communicate over a wireless network. In particular, the patents are directed to methods and systems for selecting antennas in multiple-input, multiple-output (MIMO) wireless networks.” 

The plaintiff further stated, “The technology of the patents-in-suit was developed by engineers at the Mitsubishi Electric Research Laboratories (MERL), which is the North American arm of Mitsubishi Electric. MERL was founded in 1991 in Cambridge, Massachusetts, and has been known for its focus on innovation and long-range research.  From its beginning, MERL was focused on pioneering new technologies in various industries, including computer graphics, digital communication, medical imaging, transportation etc.’  In the early 2000s, for example, ‘MERL focused on standardization and developments of new emerging technologies,’ such as ‘antenna selection, channel equalization, efficient channel state estimation, and Orthogonal Frequency Division Multiplexing (OFDM).’”

Plaintiff also stated, “The inventions disclosed in the patents-in-suit have been cited during patent prosecution multiple times by electronics companies, including Apple, Broadcom, Cisco, Ericsson, Fujitsu, Hewlett Packard, Hitachi, Huawei, Intel, Kyocera, LG Electronics, Marvell, MediaTek, Motorola Mobility, Nokia, NTT Docomo, Panasonic, Philips, Qualcomm, Siemens, Samsung, Sharp, Sony, Toshiba, and ZTE.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “AT&T made, had made, used, imported, provided, supplied, distributed, sold, and/or offered for sale products and/or systems including, for example, its BGW320 and BGW210 Wi-Fi Gateway (with 4x4 MIMO) family of products, its DIRECTV Genie 2 (with 4x4 MIMO) family of products, and other products10 that implement MIMO Wi-Fi capabilities (‘accused products’).”

Plaintiff presented three claims for relief, including alleged direct infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,284,686, U.S. Patent No. 8,374,096, and U.S. Patent No. 8,514,815. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a permanent injunction enjoining AT&T or, in the alternative, an award of a reasonable ongoing royalty for future infringement and damages.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00418

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Patents LLC

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Mobility LLC

AT&T Services, Inc.

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Zachariah Harrington

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Matthew J Antonelli

Rehan Mohammed Safiullah

Catherine Susan Bartles

Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Talbot Richard Hansum

David Michael Dyer

Vlada A. Wendel

Brett Christopher Govett

Daniel S Leventhal

Adam Bertram Ahnhut

Shaleen Jaimesh Patel

David S Frist

Theodore Stevenson, III

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 5/20/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2023. Jury instructions due by 10/25/2024. Dispositive motions and any other motions that may require a hearing due by 6/21/2024. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Claim construction hearing set for 3/18/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/21/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

39 #1

Exhibit A (Proposed Scheduling Order)

#39

(#39) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Scheduling Order))(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#38

(#38) ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 (f) Report. The deadline for the parties to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report is up to and including September 8, 2023. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/8/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Dyer on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Dyer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Bertram Ahnhut on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Ahnhut, Adam) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

33 #1

Proposed Order

#33

(#33) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Corp.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9492305.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 5/20/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2023. Jury instructions due by 10/25/2024. Dispositive motions and any other motions that may require a hearing due by 6/21/2024. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Claim construction hearing set for 3/18/2024 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/21/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketThe Court hereby CANCELS the September 25, 2023 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order (no attachment). (tls) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Scheduling Order))(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 (f) Report. The deadline for the parties to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report is up to and including September 8, 2023. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/8/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Dyer on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Dyer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Bertram Ahnhut on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Ahnhut, Adam) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S Frist on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Frist, David) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Freedom Patents LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. by Freedom Patents LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Corp.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9492305.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less