This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2023 at 08:41:44 (UTC).

Bramber v. Henry et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 Bramber filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Henry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-01132

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr

Defendants

Henry

Sconce

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement) (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#4

(#4) NON CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed.(DarleneHansen, 4) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NON CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed.(DarleneHansen, 4) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement) (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Jessie Edward Bramber, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less