This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2023 at 07:49:39 (UTC).

Hollington v. CDM Federal Programs Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Hollington filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CDM Federal Programs Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00987

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Pertricee Hollington

Defendant and Counter Claimant

CDM FEDERAL PROGRAMS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alnisa Shakirah Bell

Jacob FreemanMordecai Oslick

Jacob Freeman Mordecai Oslick

Kathryn Christine Palamountain

Max Alexander Scharf

Counter Defendant Attorney

James William Halter

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) Withdrawal as Counsel for Plaintiff by James Halter and Blaine Bortnick of Rasco Klock Perez & Nieto, LLC, filed.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#66

(#66) RESPONSE in Opposition to #65 MOTION for Extension of Time Obtain Counsel, filed by CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

#65

(#65) MOTION for Extension of Time Obtain Counsel by Pertricee Hollington, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2023. (DarleneHansen, 4) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#64

(#64) Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #63 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #62 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#63

(#63) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CDM Federal Programs Corporation identifying CDM Smith Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#62

(#62) ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., COUNTERCLAIM against Pertricee Hollington by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#61

(#61) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

60 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#62) ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., COUNTERCLAIM against Pertricee Hollington by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pertricee Hollington. CDM Federal Programs Corporation waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Halter, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Louise Savadjian on behalf of CDM Federal Programs Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Savadjian, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDM Federal Programs Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CDM Smith Inc. for CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Bell, Alnisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alnisa Shakirah Bell on behalf of CDM Federal Programs Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Bell, Alnisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CDM Federal Programs Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13861980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Pertricee Hollington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Halter, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#67) Withdrawal as Counsel for Plaintiff by James Halter and Blaine Bortnick of Rasco Klock Perez & Nieto, LLC, filed.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#66) RESPONSE in Opposition to #65 MOTION for Extension of Time Obtain Counsel, filed by CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#65) MOTION for Extension of Time Obtain Counsel by Pertricee Hollington, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2023. (DarleneHansen, 4) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#64) Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #63 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #62 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#63) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CDM Federal Programs Corporation identifying CDM Smith Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#62) ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., COUNTERCLAIM against Pertricee Hollington by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed.(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#59) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn C. Palamountain on behalf of CDM Federal Programs Corporation, filed. (Palamountain, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#58) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett( Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
03/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Judge Allyne R. Ross regarding Defendant's intention to file a motion to dismiss by CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CDM Smith Inc. Capital Accumulation Plan) (Bell, Alnisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pertricee Hollington. CDM Federal Programs Corporation waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Halter, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Louise Savadjian on behalf of CDM Federal Programs Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Savadjian, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDM Federal Programs Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CDM Smith Inc. for CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Bell, Alnisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alnisa Shakirah Bell on behalf of CDM Federal Programs Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Bell, Alnisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CDM Federal Programs Corporation. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such., (Landow, Concetta) Modified docket text on 12/30/2020 (Florio, Lisa). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2020

DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CDM Federal Programs Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13861980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Pertricee Hollington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Halter, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/13/2022.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less