This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 08:17:11 (UTC).

SEMK Products Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 SEMK Products Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03142

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEMK Products Limited

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEMK Products Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 15 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order to and including 6/22/2023 #24 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#24

(#24) MOTION by Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#23

(#23) SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000 posted by SEMK Products Limited. (Document not scanned) (aee, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#20

(#20) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#10

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#9

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by SEMK Products Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20654556. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEMK Products Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 15 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order to and including 6/22/2023 #24 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION by Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000 posted by SEMK Products Limited. (Document not scanned) (aee, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/25/2023. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by SEMK Products Limited (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SEMK Products Limited (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEMK Products Limited by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by SEMK Products Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20654556. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less