This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:35:22 (UTC).

Homer v. First Federal Credit Control, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Homer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against First Federal Credit Control, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-01785

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon Homer

Defendants

First Federal Credit Control, Inc.

Convergent Outsourcing Inc.

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Tenenbaum

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21261188) filed by Jon Homer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Convergent, #3 Proposed Summons Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons Experian, #5 Proposed Summons FFCC, #6 Proposed Summons PRA)(Tenenbaum, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons Convergent

1 #3

Proposed Summons Equifax

1 #4

Proposed Summons Experian

1 #5

Proposed Summons FFCC

1 #6

Proposed Summons PRA

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Convergent Outsourcing Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, First Federal Credit Control, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (RN) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/19/2023. (ALL) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jason Tenenbaum of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/19/2023. (ALL) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Convergent Outsourcing Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, First Federal Credit Control, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (RN) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-01785-RBD-DCI. (JG) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21261188) filed by Jon Homer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Convergent, #3 Proposed Summons Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons Experian, #5 Proposed Summons FFCC, #6 Proposed Summons PRA)(Tenenbaum, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less