This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 08:06:30 (UTC).

ALEXANDER v. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 ALEXANDER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03521

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KELLEY BRISBON HODGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIAM ALEXANDER

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, filed by LIAM ALEXANDER.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#3

(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE(rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND ALEXANDER AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF ALEXANDER SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, COMPLETE THE FORM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 9/14/23. 9/14/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK SHALL CLOSE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 11/7/23. 11/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ALEXANDER.(rf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023

DocketDOC 5 MAILED TO ALEXANDER (rf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER THAT CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK SHALL CLOSE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 11/7/23. 11/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ALEXANDER.(rf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketDocument 4 mailed to LIAM ALEXANDER. (mac) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND ALEXANDER AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF ALEXANDER SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, COMPLETE THE FORM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 9/14/23. 9/14/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketE CONSENT NOTICE MAILED TO ALEXANDER (rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE(rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, filed by LIAM ALEXANDER.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LIAM ALEXANDER..(rf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less