This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2023 at 08:00:47 (UTC).

Pulte Home Company LLC v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Pulte Home Company LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cindy K Jorgenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cindy K Jorgenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pulte Home Company LLC

Defendants

Clarendon National Insurance Company

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Knight Specialty Insurance Company

Cincinnati Indemnity Company

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company

Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Endurance American Insurance Company

Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company

First Mercury Insurance Company

Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company

First Specialty Insurance Corporation

Peleus Insurance Company

United Fire and Casualty Company

Wesco Insurance Company

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Travelers Indemnity Company of America

Colorado Casualty Insurance Company

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott S Thomas

Defendant Attorneys

Lesley W Robertson

Brent Randall Phillips

Other Attorneys

Christopher J Bork

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#52

(#52) ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#51

(#51) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Peleus Insurance Company on 5/22/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#50

(#50) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/7/23 to The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company . (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#49

(#49) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Acceptance of Service re: First Amended Complaint and Summons upon Peleus Insurance Company on 6/7/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#48

(#48) Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#47

(#47) *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Christopher J Bork. (Bork, Christopher) *Modified to reflect Attorney not terminated correctly on 6/7/2023 (SCA). (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#46

(#46) SUMMONS Submitted by Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#39

(#52) ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

5 #22

Summons

5 #18

Summons

5 #15

Summons

5 #14

Summons

5 #10

Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pulte Home Company LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21791908. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-167-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#52) ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Clarendon National Insurance Company.(Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Peleus Insurance Company on 5/22/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#50) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/7/23 to The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company . (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Acceptance of Service re: First Amended Complaint and Summons upon Peleus Insurance Company on 6/7/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Christopher J Bork. (Bork, Christopher) *Modified to reflect Attorney not terminated correctly on 6/7/2023 (SCA). (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) SUMMONS Submitted by Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#45) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Phillips, Brent) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Bork, Christopher) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon BITCO National Insurance Company on 05/09/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pulte Home Company LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint on Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc. upon Arizona Director of Insurance on 05/12/23. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pulte Home Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent PulteGroup, Inc. for Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (US) Incorporated. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bitco National Insurance Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, James River Insurance Company, Knight Specialty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company, NGM Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Peleus Insurance Company, Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Corporation, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, United Fire and Casualty Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons)(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pulte Home Company LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Pulte Home Company LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21791908. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-167-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21791908 filed by Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less