This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2023 at 11:05:30 (UTC).

Quezon et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Quezon was filed as a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00921

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Quezon

Anna M. Quezon

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

San Diego Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark W. Gibson

Tionna Dolin

Rabiya F. Tirmizi

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Tsai

Spencer Peter Hugret

Timothy Alexander Hanna

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION for Order to Continue Jurisdiction by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#17

(#17) JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff's against FCA US, LLC. in the amount of $105,000.00. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

#16

(#16) Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/7/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

15 #1

Proposed Judgment

#15

(#15) MOTION to Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a), by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/28/2023 to send QC Mailer re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF (maq). (Entered: 07/28/2023)

11 #13

Exhibit K

11 #12

Exhibit J

11 #11

Exhibit I

11 #10

Exhibit H

11 #9

Exhibit G

11 #8

Exhibit F

11 #6

Exhibit D

11 #5

Exhibit C

11 #4

Exhibit B

11 #3

Exhibit A

11 #2

Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand

11 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/10/2023 to send QC Mailer re: s/ signature does not match CM/ECF user account/withdraw & refile (maq). (Entered: 07/07/2023)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION for Order to Continue Jurisdiction by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff's against FCA US, LLC. in the amount of $105,000.00. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/7/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a), by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/28/2023 to send QC Mailer re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF (maq). (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: finding as moot #11 Motion to Remand to State Court, in light of the parties' settlement. (no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: A settlement has been reached in this case with respect to all claims and all parties. Doc. No. 12. The July 10, 2023 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference are vacated. The attorneys must appear for a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") on October 13, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. unless a joint motion for dismissal is filed with the Court, and a separate proposed order for dismissal is e-mailed to the district judge's e-mail address, prior to the SDC. To participate in the conference, counsel must dial the toll-free number, 1-877-873-8017, and use access code 2924630, and enter * if prompted for a security code. Participants will remain on hold until the Court activates the conference call. The SDC will be vacated if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers beforehand.(no document attached) (kxb) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Acceptance of Offer, #2 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (maq). (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anna M. Quezon, David Quezon. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/10/2023 to send QC Mailer re: s/ signature does not match CM/ECF user account/withdraw & refile (maq). (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Rabiya F. Tirmizi on behalf of Anna M. Quezon (Tirmizi, Rabiya) Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Anna M. Quezon (pty:pla) (maq). (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Scheduling REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dolin, Tionna) (maq). (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • Docket(#8) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: The Court is in receipt of Defendants Notice of Removal and recognizes it had filed a motion to compel arbitration in state court prior to removing the action. To the extent Defendant wishes to pursue a motion to compel arbitration with this court, Defendant must file such motion no later than June 30, 2023, and in accordance with Local and Chambers Rules. (no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance ; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation & Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/22/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanna, Timothy) (maq). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (maq). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Tsai on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (maq). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.), Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.) for FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (maq). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US, LLC. (ggv) Modified (sjt). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17862031.), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of ET iso Removal, #3 Exhibit A to ET Decl, #4 Exhibit B to ET Decl, #5 Exhibit C to ET Decl, #6 Exhibit D to ET Decl, #7 Exhibit E to ET Decl, #8 Exhibit F to ET Decl, #9 Exhibit G to ET Decl, #10 Exhibit H to ET Decl, #11 Exhibit I to ET Decl, #12 Exhibit J to ET Decl, #13 Exhibit K to ET Decl, #14 Exhibit L to ET Decl, #15 Exhibit M to ET Decl, #16 Exhibit N to ET Decl, #17 Exhibit O to ET Decl, #18 Exhibit P to ET Decl, #19 Exhibit Q to ET Decl, #20 Exhibit R to ET Decl, #21 Exhibit S to ET Decl, #22 Exhibit T to ET Decl, #23 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-921-AJB-KSC. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less