This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2023 at 08:48:57 (UTC).

Crihfield v. BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 Crihfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bradley W. Rath and Halil S. Ozerden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bradley W. Rath

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Crihfield

Defendants

LBS Group, LLC

John Does 1-10

Corporations A-Z

BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin U. Bowden

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Reeder McCrory

Kyle Stuart Moran

John Patrick McMackin

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LBS Group, LLC from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number 24CI1:23cv00246, jury demand lower court. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 1470) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(RLW) Modified on 9/25/2023 to add receipt number (RLW). (Entered: 09/22/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court File

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Stuart Moran on behalf of LBS Group, LLC (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick McMackin on behalf of LBS Group, LLC (McMackin, John) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by LBS Group, LLC (McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by LBS Group, LLC.(McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LBS Group, LLC (McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Michael Crihfield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Second Amended Complaint)(Bowden, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit "A" Second Amended Complaint

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Michael Crihfield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Second Amended Complaint)(Bowden, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

8 #1

Exhibit A Second Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) **DISREGARD**AMENDED COMPLAINT Substitution of Parties (BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC in place of AT&T, Inc.) against AT&T, Inc., Corporations A-Z, John Does 1-10, LBS Group, LLC, filed by Michael Crihfield. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC (BellSouth))(Bowden, Benjamin) Modified on 11/6/2023 (JCH). (Entered: 11/06/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2023

DocketRemark: Original issued summonses for service and return were emailed to attorney. (RLW) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (RLW) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corporations A-Z, John Does 1-10, LBS Group, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC, filed by Michael Crihfield.(Bowden, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 9. 1.) Proposed summons should not be attached to the Amended Complaint for issuance. 2.) Incorrect case number, the correct case number is 1:23cv242 HSO-BWR 3.) AT&T, Inc. is no longer a party to this case according to the Amended Complaint, yet they were selected in the docket entry as the party that this filing is against. This document should be re-filed with all necessary changes made. The new Bellsouth party should be added as a defendant (not added in all caps) and all the proper defendants should be selected at the time of filing. This document will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) **DISREGARD**AMENDED COMPLAINT Substitution of Parties (BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC in place of AT&T, Inc.) against AT&T, Inc., Corporations A-Z, John Does 1-10, LBS Group, LLC, filed by Michael Crihfield. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC (BellSouth))(Bowden, Benjamin) Modified on 11/6/2023 (JCH). (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion #8 for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint as unopposed and denying Plaintiff's Motion #7 for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint as moot. Plaintiff must file the second amended complaint by November 10, 2023. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 11/3/2023 (rjc) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 8. 1.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to label each exhibit with a letter/number in future filings. 2.) The proposed amended complaint that is attached is styled for Circuit Court. Attorney is advised that if the motion is granted, that the style should be corrected prior to filing in District Court. (JCH) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Michael Crihfield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Second Amended Complaint)(Bowden, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 7. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to label each exhibit with a letter/number in future filings. (JCH) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Michael Crihfield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Second Amended Complaint)(Bowden, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5. Attorney is advised that this document should have been filed as an "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Answers" category. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LBS Group, LLC (McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by LBS Group, LLC.(McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant LBS Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion #4 for Time. LBS Group, LLC's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [1-1] is now due on 10/13/2023. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 9/28/2023 (rjc) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by LBS Group, LLC (McCrory, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick McMackin on behalf of LBS Group, LLC (McMackin, John) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Stuart Moran on behalf of LBS Group, LLC (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LBS Group, LLC from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number 24CI1:23cv00246, jury demand lower court. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 1470) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(RLW) Modified on 9/25/2023 to add receipt number (RLW). (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less