This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:11:35 (UTC).

Jacob Brady v. Idaho Central Credit Union et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Jacob Brady filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Idaho Central Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-01719

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Brady

Defendants

Idaho Central Credit Union

Transunion, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Forrester Charity

Defendant Attorney

Hillary J Green

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36047903 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Jacob Brady (pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady, (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Attachments: #1 Summons (TransUnion), #2 Summons (Experian))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

4 #1

Summons (TransUnion)

4 #2

Summons (Experian)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Idaho Central Credit Union, Transunion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Transunion, LLC, #2 Summons as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

7 #1

Summons as to Defendant Transunion, LLC

7 #2

Summons as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jacob Brady. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady, upon Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/29/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Hillary J Green added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Green, Hillary) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Green, Hillary) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/9/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Green, Hillary) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/29/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Hillary J Green added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Green, Hillary) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady, upon Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jacob Brady. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Idaho Central Credit Union, Transunion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Transunion, LLC, #2 Summons as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Attachments: #1 Summons (TransUnion), #2 Summons (Experian))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady, (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36047903 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jacob Brady. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Jacob Brady (pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less