This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2023 at 07:28:55 (UTC).

INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK

Defendants

NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Siri

Elizabeth Ann Brehm

Defendant Attorney

John Bardo

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. Attorney Colin M. Farnsworth terminated. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report on or before June 5, 2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 8, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Bardo, John) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/17/23. (DM) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/10/2023 (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH served on 4/10/2023 (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 10, 2023. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/6/2023. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin M. Farnsworth on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

1 #6

Summons to USAG

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9975859) filed by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to HHS, #5 Summons to NIH, #6 Summons to USAG, #7 Summons to US Attorney)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. Attorney Colin M. Farnsworth terminated. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2023. (dot) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report on or before June 5, 2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 8, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Bardo, John) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/17/23. (DM) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/10/2023 (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH served on 4/10/2023 (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 10, 2023. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/6/2023. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin M. Farnsworth on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zljn) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9975859) filed by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to HHS, #5 Summons to NIH, #6 Summons to USAG, #7 Summons to US Attorney)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less