This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2023 at 07:36:12 (UTC).

Sorenson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 Sorenson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lauren King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00804

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lauren King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norita C Sorenson

Defendants

Canvas Ct LLC

Cleaver-Brooks Inc

Honeywell International Inc

Howden North America Inc

Joy Global Underground Mining LLC

Milwaukee Valve Company LLC

Morse Tec LLC

OfficeMax Incorporated

Paramount Global

Pneumo Abex LLC

Redco Corporation

Valves and Controls US Inc

WW Henry Company LP

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Alaskan Copper Companies Inc

American President Lines LLC

Armstrong International Inc

Aurora Pump Company

74 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meredith B Good

Defendant Attorneys

Erin P Fraser

Cassandra Ekure

Jeffrey M Odom

Diane Catherine Babbitt

Daniel Allen Womac

Malika Johnson

R Dirk Bernhardt

Christopher S Marks

George S. Pitcher

Ryan J Groshong

G William Shaw

Lucy Boateng-Agyei

Rachel Tallon Reynolds

Other Attorneys

Claude Bosworth

Kevin Clonts

Rachel A Rubin

Jason H Daywitt

Melissa K Roeder

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#224

(#224) WW Henry Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, and Complaint by WW Henry Company LP.(Bannan, Carinne) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#223

(#223) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by WW Henry Company LP. (Bannan, Carinne) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#222

(#222) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Flowserve US Inc. (Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#221

(#221) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND by Flowserve US Inc.(Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

220 #2

Proposed Order

220 #1

Exhibit

#220

(#220) MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Norita C Sorenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2023, (Dineen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

#219

(#219) AMENDMENT to #215 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Flowserve US Inc (Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#215

Attorney Erin P Fraser added for Defendant Flowserve US Inc per dkt #215 Notice of Appearance. (SS) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bernhardt, R) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Affidavit of J. Thomas Schroppe

1 #3

Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to Puget Sound Commerce Center LLC

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Service

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#218) Defendant Industrial Service Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Industrial Service Solutions LLC.(Babbitt, Diane) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

222 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) WW Henry Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, and Complaint by WW Henry Company LP.(Bannan, Carinne) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by WW Henry Company LP. (Bannan, Carinne) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#222) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Flowserve US Inc. (Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#221) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND by Flowserve US Inc.(Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#220) MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Norita C Sorenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2023, (Dineen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#219) AMENDMENT to #215 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Flowserve US Inc (Reynolds, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#218) Defendant Industrial Service Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Industrial Service Solutions LLC.(Babbitt, Diane) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Erin P Fraser added for Defendant Flowserve US Inc per dkt #215 Notice of Appearance. (SS) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#217) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ISS Valves Industries, Inc. for Industrial Service Solutions LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Industrial Service Solutions LLC. (Babbitt, Diane) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#216) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt on behalf of Defendant Industrial Service Solutions LLC. (Babbitt, Diane) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Luk Clutch Systems LLC. (Odom, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Superior Boiler Works Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Redco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement)(Shaw, G) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bernhardt, R) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-08173-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8027536) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum to Puget Sound Commerce Center LLC, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Thomas Schroppe, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernhardt, R) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less