6:23-CV-00530
07/21/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Orlando L. Garcia
Stasit, LLC
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
William P. Ramey, III
Joseph J. Zito
Melissa Richards Smith
(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17686396), filed by Stasit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
Exhibit A-B
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Stasit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
Exhibit A
(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stasit, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
Proposed Order
(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Zito on behalf of Stasit, LLC. Attorney Joseph J. Zito added to party Stasit, LLC(pty:pla) (Zito, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2023)
Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Zito on behalf of Stasit, LLC. Attorney Joseph J. Zito added to party Stasit, LLC(pty:pla) (Zito, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's answer or responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before October 20, 2023. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stasit, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Stasit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17686396), filed by Stasit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
[-] Read Less