This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 14:00:04 (UTC).

Anderke v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 Anderke filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lauren King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01466

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lauren King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karin Anderke

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melton L Crawford

Defendant Attorney

Lauren D Parris Watts

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-8171747) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Karin Anderke(pty:pla) filed by Karin Anderke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (RE) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Prudential Insurance Company of America on 9/25/2023, filed by Plaintiff Karin Anderke. (Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative And Additional Defenses Attorney Lauren D Parris Watts added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Parris Watts, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Parris Watts, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/4/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2023, Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/4/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2023, Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Parris Watts, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative And Additional Defenses Attorney Lauren D Parris Watts added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Parris Watts, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Prudential Insurance Company of America on 9/25/2023, filed by Plaintiff Karin Anderke. (Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (RE) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketJudge Lauren King added. (RE) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-8171747) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Karin Anderke(pty:pla) filed by Karin Anderke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less