This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:46:19 (UTC).

Tusa et al v. Israel & Sylvia Goldberg Properties, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Tusa filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Israel Sylvia Goldberg Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna Phillips Currault and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01770

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Salvador T Tusa

Central Grocery Co., LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Israel & Sylvia Goldberg Properties, LLC

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendant and Defendant

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward John Rantz, Jr.

Evian Mugrabi

Ira J. Middleberg

Jean-Paul J. Morrell

Yvette Anne D'Aunoy

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen P. Schott

Seth Andrew Schmeeckle

Heather Nicole Sharp

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Seth Andrew Schmeeckle

Heather Nicole Sharp

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Israel & Sylvia Goldberg Properties, LLC on 7/6/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (D'Aunoy, Yvette) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/18/2023) (js). (Entered: 07/17/2023)

10 #1

Judgment on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition

#10

(#10) Notice of Compliance: Amendment/Supplement to Document by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company re #7 Notice of Compliance, #2 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Judgment on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text on 6/20/2023 (js). (Entered: 06/19/2023)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Notice of Compliance by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company to #2 Notice of Removal Response to Court's 28 USC 1447(b) Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text/event on 6/9/2023 (js). (Entered: 06/08/2023)

2 #12

Exhibit 12 - Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447

2 #10

Exhibit 10 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal

2 #9

Exhibit 9

2 #7

Exhibit 7

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#1) FILED IN ERROR: SEE R. DOC #2 : NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court - Orleans Parish, case number 2022-7848 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9954332) filed by Hartford Underwriters Inc. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party Hartford Underwriters Inc. Co.(pty:dft).(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified on 5/26/2023 (js). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Waiver of Service Executed. Documents submitted as legal sized documents. Local Rule 10.1E: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (js) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Israel & Sylvia Goldberg Properties, LLC on 7/6/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (D'Aunoy, Yvette) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/18/2023) (js). (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Notice of Compliance: Amendment/Supplement to Document by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company re #7 Notice of Compliance, #2 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Judgment on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text on 6/20/2023 (js). (Entered: 06/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER: When this case was initially removed to this Court, it was identified as related to Hurricane Ida and therefore placed under the Hurricane Ida Claims Amended Case Management Order No. 1. R. Doc. #6 . However, after reviewing the Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages, the Court has determined that the case is not appropriate for inclusion in the Streamlined Settlement Program ("SSP"). Furthermore, the parties had opted out of the Case Management Order and Streamlined Settlement Program in the state court. See R. Doc. 2-9, p. 72. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this matter is removed from the Hurricane Ida Claims Amended Case Management Order No. 1, including the Streamlined Settlement Program therein, and returned to the Courts regular docket. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/15/2023.(js) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition For Damages by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Sharp, Heather) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company to #2 Notice of Removal Response to Court's 28 USC 1447(b) Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text/event on 6/9/2023 (js). (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(js) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(js) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Notice of Removal. (1) Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (js) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 22-07848, B-5 (Fee previously paid) filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmeeckle, Seth) (Attachment 13 replaced on 5/26/2023) (js). Modified text/filers on 5/26/2023 (js). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) FILED IN ERROR: SEE R. DOC #2 : NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court - Orleans Parish, case number 2022-7848 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9954332) filed by Hartford Underwriters Inc. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party Hartford Underwriters Inc. Co.(pty:dft).(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified on 5/26/2023 (js). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less