This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2023 at 20:36:41 (UTC).

Schwartz v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 Schwartz filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:23-CV-04579

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leah Schwartz

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

TransUnion, LLC

American Express National Bank

Barclays Bank Delaware

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eliyahu R Babad

Defendant Attorneys

Summer Flowers

Camille Renee Nicodemus

Nadia A. Zivkov

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#34

(#34) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#33

(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Nadia A. Zivkov dated July 26, 2023., #1 Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant American Express' consented-to request. Defendant American Express is granted leave to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by on or before August 25, 2023. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 30. American Express National Bank answer due 8/25/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/27/2023) (ate) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

#31

(#31) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Flowers, Summer) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#30

(#30) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Nadia A. Zivkov dated July 26, 2023. Document filed by American Express National Bank..(Zivkov, Nadia) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#28

(#28) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Summer L. Flowers dated July 7, 2023., #1 Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant's consented-to request. Defendant is granted leave to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 26, 2023. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 25. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/7/2023) (ate) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#9

(#29) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

5 #1

Supplement Summons Rider

#5

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eliyahu R Babad to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Defendant party name error listed on Summons and Summons Caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. Document filed by Leah Schwartz..(Babad, Eliyahu) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

3 #1

Supplement Summons Rider

#3

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eliyahu R Babad to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all Defendants as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Babad, Eliyahu) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#1

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Summer L. Flowers dated July 7, 2023., #1 Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant's consented-to request. Defendant is granted leave to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 26, 2023. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 25. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/7/2023) (ate) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Nadia A. Zivkov dated July 26, 2023., #1 Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant American Express' consented-to request. Defendant American Express is granted leave to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by on or before August 25, 2023. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 30. American Express National Bank answer due 8/25/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/27/2023) (ate) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Flowers, Summer) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Nadia A. Zivkov dated July 26, 2023. Document filed by American Express National Bank..(Zivkov, Nadia) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #25 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Summer L. Flowers dated July 7, 2023., #1 Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant's consented-to request. Defendant is granted leave to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 26, 2023. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 25. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/7/2023) (ate) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eliyahu R Babad to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Defendant party name error listed on Summons and Summons Caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax Information Services, LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; TransUnion, LLC; American Express National Bank; and Barclays Bank Delaware, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leah Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Rider).(Babad, Eliyahu) Modified on 6/2/2023 (vf). (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eliyahu R Babad to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all Defendants as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. Document filed by Leah Schwartz..(Babad, Eliyahu) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; TransUnion, LLC; American Express National Bank; and Barclays Bank Delaware, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leah Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Rider).(Babad, Eliyahu) Modified on 6/1/2023 (sj). (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Babad, Eliyahu) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express National Bank, Barclays Bank Delaware, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27812908)Document filed by Leah Schwartz..(Babad, Eliyahu) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less