This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2023 at 08:09:04 (UTC).

Bright Data Ltd. v. Oxylabs, UAB

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 Bright Data Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oxylabs, UAB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant

Bright Data Ltd.

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Oxylabs, UAB

Metacluster LT, UAB

Bright Data Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Gregory Blake Thompson

James Mark Mann

Robert M Harkins, Jr

Ronald Wielkopolski

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brett Christopher Govett

Anna Rebecca Skupin

Anthony Matthew Garza

Christopher Thor Bovenkamp

Craig N Tolliver

George T Scott

Daniel S Leventhal

Mitchell Reed Sibley

Steven Chase Callahan

Michael Charles Smith

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Gregory Blake Thompson

James Mark Mann

Robert M Harkins, Jr

Ronald Wielkopolski

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bright Data Ltd., Oxylabs, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wielkopolski, Ronald) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #19 Answer to Counterclaim, (OXYLABS' ANSWER TO BRIGHT DATA'S DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COUNTERCLAIMS) by Oxylabs, UAB.(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Oxylabs, UAB by Bright Data Ltd..(Harkins, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

15 #41

Exhibit 41

15 #38

Exhibit 38

15 #35

Exhibit 35

15 #25

Exhibit 25

15 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #16

Exhibit P

2 #14

Exhibit N

2 #13

Exhibit M

2 #11

Exhibit K

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

#1

(#1) ORDER - Clerk is directed to open a new civil action, showing this action as related, with Bright Data Ltd. as the plaintiff and Oxylabs, UAB (f/k/a Metacluster LT, UAB) as the defendant. The Clerk shall file a copy of this Order as the first filing, along with a copy of Bright Datas Answer To Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement (Dkt. No. 105). This new severed action shall concern only the Fourth Counterclaim (Infringement of the 317 Patent) at 57-70. All future filings regarding the Fourth Counterclaim shall be filed in this newly severed action. (CASE WAS SEVERED FROM 2:22-CV-11) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/14/2023. (ch, ) Modified on 4/14/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/14/2023)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bright Data Ltd., Oxylabs, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wielkopolski, Ronald) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ANSWER to #19 Answer to Counterclaim, (OXYLABS' ANSWER TO BRIGHT DATA'S DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COUNTERCLAIMS) by Oxylabs, UAB.(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2023. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court then gave counsel Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Oxylabs, UAB by Bright Data Ltd..(Harkins, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Bright Data Ltd. re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Wielkopolski, Ronald) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Oxylabs, UAB (OXYLABS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Oxylabs' Answer to Counterclaim), COUNTERCLAIM against Bright Data Ltd. by Oxylabs, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43)(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell Reed Sibley on behalf of Oxylabs, UAB (Sibley, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George T Scott on behalf of Oxylabs, UAB (Scott, George) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thor Bovenkamp on behalf of Oxylabs, UAB (Bovenkamp, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Matthew Garza on behalf of Oxylabs, UAB (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Bright Data Ltd. (Mann, James) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Bright Data Ltd. (Thompson, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Wielkopolski on behalf of Bright Data Ltd. (Wielkopolski, Ronald) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Oxylabs, UAB (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) BRIGHT DATAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) ORDER - Clerk is directed to open a new civil action, showing this action as related, with Bright Data Ltd. as the plaintiff and Oxylabs, UAB (f/k/a Metacluster LT, UAB) as the defendant. The Clerk shall file a copy of this Order as the first filing, along with a copy of Bright Datas Answer To Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement (Dkt. No. 105). This new severed action shall concern only the Fourth Counterclaim (Infringement of the 317 Patent) at 57-70. All future filings regarding the Fourth Counterclaim shall be filed in this newly severed action. (CASE WAS SEVERED FROM 2:22-CV-11) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/14/2023. (ch, ) Modified on 4/14/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less