This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 14:26:39 (UTC).

State Farm General Insurance Company et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 State Farm General Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Fred W. Slaughter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-01731

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm General Insurance Company

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Does 1-20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian S Letofsky

Defendant Attorneys

David William Kempen

Jeffrey R Williams

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet

#18

(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Second Amended ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

17 #1

Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet

#17

(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#16

(#16) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference and ORDERING Counsel to Review Local Procedure by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: No later than 11/9/2023, counsel shall file an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report with a fully completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 11/30/2023 at 09:00 AM. See document for further information. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#15

(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#14

(#14) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:23-01731-FWS (DFMx). (dgo) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:23-cv-01731 CJC (DFMx). (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Removal of Action

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice to Advesrse Party of Removal of Action

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Subrogation Comp

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A -Summons and Complaint

#1

NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Second Amended ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference and ORDERING Counsel to Review Local Procedure by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: No later than 11/9/2023, counsel shall file an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report with a fully completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 11/30/2023 at 09:00 AM. See document for further information. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc... (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:23-01731-FWS (DFMx). (dgo) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 11/20/2023 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/10/2023. (eva) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:23-cv-01731 JVS(DFMx). (rn) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on November 16, 2023. (rrp) (Entered: 09/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:23-cv-01731 CJC (DFMx). (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/28/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, Orange County, case number 30-2023-01339609-CU-NP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36040688 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Subrogation Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice to Advesrse Party of Removal of Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Removal of Action) (Attorney Jeffrey R Williams added to party HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. a Delaware corporation(pty:bkmov), Attorney Jeffrey R Williams added to party Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less