This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2023 at 07:17:09 (UTC).

LEGGETT v. WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 LEGGETT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSHUA LEGGETT

Defendant

WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Clif Alexander

William Clifton Alexander

Austin W. Anderson

Carl A. Fitz

Carter Tilden Hastings

Joshua P. Geist

William F. Goodrich

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin Ahr

Marc Williams

Carolyn Batz McGee

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Kristin Ahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/24/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

(#19) MOTION for attorney Kristin M. Ahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7798265) by WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahr, Kristin) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Marc Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/12/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Affidavit

#17

(#17) MOTION for attorney Marc E. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7778406) by WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Marc) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

14 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Austin W. Anderson

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Carl Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/16/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSHUA LEGGETT. WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Goodrich on behalf of JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Goodrich, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Geist on behalf of JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Geist, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/31/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION (sdp) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC770928), filed by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Kristin Ahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/24/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION for attorney Kristin M. Ahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7798265) by WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahr, Kristin) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Marc Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/12/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION for attorney Marc E. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7778406) by WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Marc) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Austin Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION for attorney Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7777538) by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Austin W. Anderson, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Austin) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MOTION for attorney Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7777508) by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Clif Alexander, #2 Proposed Order) (Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Carter Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for attorney Carter T. Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7776233) by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Carter T. Hastings, #2 Proposed Order) (Hastings, Carter) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION Answer due from WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION on 7/31/2023. (McGee, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Batz McGee on behalf of WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION. (McGee, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Carl Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/16/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7741890) by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Fitz, Carl) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSHUA LEGGETT. WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Goodrich on behalf of JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Goodrich, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Geist on behalf of JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Geist, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/31/2023. (dmm) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION (sdp) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC770928), filed by JOSHUA LEGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less