This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2023 at 08:03:22 (UTC).

Daingean Technologies Ltd. v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2023 Daingean Technologies Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt and Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01560

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

Presiding Judge

Ruth Bermudez Montenegro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daingean Technologies Ltd.

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amir H. Alavi

Justin Yee-jin Chen

Michael D. McBride

Demetrios Anaipakos

Eric J Enger

Alden G. Harris

Blaine Andrew Larson

Michael F. Heim

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

James Richard Patterson

Jennifer M. French

Defendant Attorney

James R. Batchelder

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Apple Inc.. (Batchelder, James)Attorney James R. Batchelder added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#24

(#24) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18171221.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bullwinkel, Robert) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

23 #1

CORRECTED Summons Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd.. Apple Inc. s

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #16 by Daingean Technologies Ltd. re #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Summons Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Apple Inc. served on August 28, 2023)(French, Jennifer) (maq). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#21

(#21) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18170054.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Larson, Blaine) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#20

(#20) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18170016.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Harris, Alden) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#18

(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18169974.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Enger, Eric) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#16

(#23) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #16 by Daingean Technologies Ltd. re #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Summons Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Apple Inc. served on August 28, 2023)(French, Jennifer) (maq). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#8

(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18153273.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Alavi, Amir) (rmc). (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1560-RBM-JLB. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/28/2023.(jms) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

#6

(#6) Amended REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,484,976*, *10,841,958*, *10,932,207*, *1,134,400*, *11,196,509*, *1,134,400* cc:USPTO (ggv) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,484,976*, *10,841,958*, *10,932,207*, *1,134,400*, *11,196,509* cc:USPTO (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daingean Technologies Ltd. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ggv)(sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

1 #2

Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Apple Inc.. (Batchelder, James)Attorney James R. Batchelder added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MINUTE ORDER: Defendant Apple, Inc. has filed an Unopposed Motion to extend its time to respond to Plaintiff Daingean Technologies, Ltd.s Complaint by 45 days. (Doc. #26 ) The Motion is GRANTED. Apple shall respond to the Complaint on or before 11/02/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (no document attached) (maq) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Apple Inc.. (Batchelder, James)Attorney James R. Batchelder added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

Docket(#25) PRO HAC APPROVED: Robert Allan Bullwinkel appearing for Plaintiff Daingean Technologies Ltd. (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18171221.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bullwinkel, Robert) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #16 by Daingean Technologies Ltd. re #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Summons Returned Executed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. Apple Inc. served on August 28, 2023)(French, Jennifer) (maq). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

Docket(#22) PRO HAC APPROVED: Alden G. Harris, Blaine Andrew Larson appearing for Plaintiff Daingean Technologies Ltd. (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18170054.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Larson, Blaine) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18170016.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Harris, Alden) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

Docket(#19) PRO HAC APPROVED: Eric J Enger, Michael F. Heim appearing for Plaintiff Daingean Technologies Ltd. (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18169974.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Enger, Eric) (rmc). (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18153921.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (rmc). (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

Docket(#9) PRO HAC APPROVED: Amir H. Alavi appearing for Plaintiff Daingean Technologies Ltd. (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18153273.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Alavi, Amir) (rmc). (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1560-RBM-JLB. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/28/2023.(jms) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Amended REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,484,976*, *10,841,958*, *10,932,207*, *1,134,400*, *11,196,509*, *1,134,400* cc:USPTO (ggv) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1560-AGS-JLB.(no document attached) (ddf) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,484,976*, *10,841,958*, *10,932,207*, *1,134,400*, *11,196,509* cc:USPTO (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daingean Technologies Ltd. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ggv)(sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18132071.), filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1560-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (French, Jennifer)(ggv)(sjt). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less