This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2023 at 08:06:34 (UTC).

Lamendola v. Abbott Laboratories

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 Lamendola filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02269

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristen Lamendola

Defendant

Abbott Laboratories

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Hammers

Defendant Attorneys

Meir Feder

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kristen Lamendola; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20529133. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Lamendola as to Abbott Laboratories on 4/25/2023, answer due 5/16/2023. (Hammers, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Lamendola as to Abbott Laboratories on 4/25/2023, answer due 5/16/2023. (Hammers, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Abbott Laboratories (smb, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kristen Lamendola; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20529133. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less