This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2023 at 07:18:53 (UTC).

HWANG v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 HWANG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01739

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAEMYUNG HWANG

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN T. NEWMAN

Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLAS FOPPIANO

RICHARD D. GABLE, JR.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16673341), filed by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #4

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ARX Executive Holdings LLP with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

#3

(#3) Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. . (FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. with Certificate of Service(GABLE, RICHARD) *SEE DOC. #5 FOR CORRECT PDF* Modified on 5/9/2023 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. with Certificate of Service(GABLE, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/7/23 AT 2:00 PM WITH THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER IN CHAMBERS. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel, #2 Rule 26)(mbh) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

6 #1

Notice to Counsel

6 #2

Rule 26

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(GABLE, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/7/2023 04:00 PM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketOrder #10 mailed to unrep. (fdc) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/13/2023 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/11/2023. MOTIONS DUE BY 11/1/2023. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/1/2023. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2023. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/6/2023. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/19/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/8/23. 6/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, ) Modified on 6/9/2023 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SERVED, #3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #4 ORDER, #5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #6 AFFIDAVIT, #7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #8 AFFIDAVIT, #9 PRAECIPE, #10 COMPLAINT, #11 WITHDRAWAL, #12 AFFIDAVIT, #13 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(amas) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/7/2023 04:00 PM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(GABLE, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/7/23 AT 2:00 PM WITH THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER IN CHAMBERS. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel, #2 Rule 26)(mbh) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. with Certificate of Service(GABLE, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. with Certificate of Service(GABLE, RICHARD) *SEE DOC. #5 FOR CORRECT PDF* Modified on 5/9/2023 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. . (FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ARX Executive Holdings LLP with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16673341), filed by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less