This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2023 at 09:15:13 (UTC).

Metropolitan Life Insurance Co v. Boutte et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 Metropolitan Life Insurance Co filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Boutte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01256

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Metropolitan Life Insurance Co

Defendants

Lekisha Boutte

Gregory Keith Boutte

Shannon Dewayne Boutte

Latoya Nicole Boutte

Denise Michele Vernon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle L Gideon

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Gregory Keith Boutte, Latoya Nicole Boutte, Lekisha Boutte, Shannon Dewayne Boutte, Denise Michele Vernon (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5688306) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A - SPD, #3 Exhibit Exh B - 2019 Beneficiary Designation, #4 Exhibit Exh C - 1987 Beneficiary Designation)(Attorney Kyle L Gideon added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Co(pty:intpl))(aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exh A - SPD

1 #3

Exhibit Exh B - 2019 Beneficiary Designation

1 #4

Exhibit Exh C - 1987 Beneficiary Designation

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregory Keith Boutte, Latoya Nicole Boutte, Lekisha Boutte, Shannon Dewayne Boutte, Denise Michele Vernon. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Kyle L Gideon on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) Modified on 9/12/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Gregory Keith Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Shannon Dewayne Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Latoya Nicole Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Lekisha Boutte served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Lekisha Boutte served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Latoya Nicole Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Shannon Dewayne Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Gregory Keith Boutte served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) Modified on 9/12/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Kyle L Gideon on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregory Keith Boutte, Latoya Nicole Boutte, Lekisha Boutte, Shannon Dewayne Boutte, Denise Michele Vernon. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Gregory Keith Boutte, Latoya Nicole Boutte, Lekisha Boutte, Shannon Dewayne Boutte, Denise Michele Vernon (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5688306) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A - SPD, #3 Exhibit Exh B - 2019 Beneficiary Designation, #4 Exhibit Exh C - 1987 Beneficiary Designation)(Attorney Kyle L Gideon added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Co(pty:intpl))(aty,Gideon, Kyle) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less